VA HJR414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ414ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ414ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Stan C. Feuerberg.
Title
Commending Stan C. Feuerberg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ414ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-09 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-07 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22106570D |