VA HJR389 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ389ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ389ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the School of Engineering and Applied Science at the University of Virginia.
Title
Commending the School of Engineering and Applied Science at the University of Virginia.
Sponsors
Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. John Cox [R] | Del. Peter Farrell [R] |
Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. James Massie [R] | Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Edward Scott [R] | Del. David Toscano [D] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ389ER) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-17 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12104192D | |
2012-02-17 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-15 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12104192D |