VA HJR293 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ293ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ293ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Stephen J. DeBenedittis.
Title
Commending Stephen J. DeBenedittis.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ293ER) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-10 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-03 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12104335D | |
2012-02-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-31 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12104335D |