VA HJR25 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ25ER)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ25ER)
Summary
Commending William Sinkler.
Title
Commending William Sinkler.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ25ER) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-01-18 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-11 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-07 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 087758776 | |
2007-12-13 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 087758776 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ25 |