VA HJR239 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ239ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ239ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Hadden Culp.
Title
Commending Hadden Culp.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ239ER) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-27 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-23 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12101105D | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12101105D |