VA HJR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR2
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); real property tax exemption; affordable housing. Provides that the General Assembly may authorize a locality to fully or partially exempt affordable housing, as such term may be defined by statute, from real property taxation.
Title
Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption for affordable housing (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100429D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HJ2 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ2+hil |