VA HJR179 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ179ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ179ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Space Flight Academy.
Title
Commending the Virginia Space Flight Academy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ179ER) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-02 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-01-30 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18104009D |