VA HJR125 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State sovereignty; Tenth Amendment of the United States Constitution. Urges Congress to honor state sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment of the Constitution of the United States and claims sovereignty for the Commonwealth under the Tenth Amendment over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the United States Constitution.
Title
State sovereignty; Congress urged to honor Tenth Amendment of U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (76-Y 20-N) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Left in Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (76-Y 20-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Agreed to by House (76-Y 20-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-15 | House: Taken up | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102610D |