VA HJR118 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; dam safety regulations; report. Requests the Department of Conservation and Recreation to study changes to Virginia's Impounding Structure Regulations that may result in cost savings to owners of dams without jeopardizing public safety.
Title
Dam safety regulations; Department of Conservation and Recreation to study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103207D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ118 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ118+hil |