VA HB994 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; Child Care Subsidy Program; Armed Forces; examination and report. Directs the Board of Education to determine the feasibility of amending its regulations to permit all active duty members of the Armed Forces of the United States who serve as caregivers to dependents to apply for the Child Care Subsidy Program and submit its findings to the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health.
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program; permitting Armed Forces active members to apply for Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB994ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB994H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105761D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105761D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100747D |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
SB529 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
SB529 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Subjects
Armed Forces
Child Care
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Child Care
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation