VA HB970 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public agencies; privacy of personal information; penalty. Provides that public agencies shall not request personal donor information, defined in the bill, from (i) any individual or any entity organized under § 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code or (ii) any bidder, offeror, or contractor of an agency. The bill prohibits such public agencies from disclosing personal information without the express, written permission of every individual who is identifiable from the potential release of such personal information, including individuals identifiable as members, supporters, or volunteers of, or donors to, the agency. The bill exempts the Campaign Finance Disclosure Act of 2006 from the requirements that public agencies protect personal information and refrain from requesting personal information. Public agencies; privacy of personal information; penalty. Provides that public agencies shall not request personal donor information, defined in the bill, from (i) any individual or any entity organized under § 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code or (ii) any bidder, offeror, or contractor of an agency. The bill prohibits such public agencies from disclosing personal information without the express, written permission of every individual who is identifiable from the potential release of such personal information, including individuals identifiable as members, supporters, or volunteers of, or donors to, the agency. The bill exempts the Campaign Finance Disclosure Act of 2006 from the requirements that public agencies protect personal information and refrain from requesting personal information.
Title
Public agencies; exclusion from mandatory disclosure, privacy of personal information, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 525 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB970ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106759D-S1 (54-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB970S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106759D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106759D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB970H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105492D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105492D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102746D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |