VA HB970 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB970
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of transportation funds. States that it is the policy of the Commonwealth that revenues dedicated to transportation purposes shall not be used or redirected for any non-transportation purpose. Any attempt to repurpose funds dedicated to transportation as of July 1, 2019, shall be deemed invalid and shall not be effectuated. Use of transportation funds. States that it is the policy of the Commonwealth that revenues dedicated to transportation purposes shall not be used or redirected for any non-transportation purpose. Any attempt to repurpose funds dedicated to transportation as of July 1, 2019, shall be deemed invalid and shall not be effectuated.
Title
Transportation; use of funds.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100282D |
Same As/Similar To
HB970 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB970 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB970+hil |