VA HB961 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting sale, transport, etc., of assault firearms, certain firearm magazines, silencers, and trigger activators; penalties. Expands the definition of "assault firearm" and prohibits any person from importing, selling, transferring, manufacturing, purchasing, or transporting an assault firearm. A violation is a Class 6 felony. The bill prohibits a dealer from selling, renting, trading, or transferring from his inventory an assault firearm to any person. The bill makes it a Class 6 felony to import, sell, transfer, manufacture, purchase, possess, or transport silencers, and trigger activators, all defined in the bill. The bill makes it a Class 6 felony to import, sell, transfer, manufacture, purchase, or transport a large-capacity firearm magazine, as defined in the bill, and a Class 1 misdemeanor to possess such large-capacity firearm magazine. Any person who legally owns a large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator on July 1, 2020, may retain possession until January 1, 2021. During that time, such person shall (i) render the large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator inoperable; (ii) remove the large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator from the Commonwealth; (iii) transfer the large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator to a person outside the Commonwealth who is not prohibited from possessing it; or (iv) surrender the large-capacity firearm magazine, silencer, or trigger activator to a state or local law-enforcement agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault firearms, certain firearm magazines, etc.; prohibiting sale, transport, etc., penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20107888D-EH1
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB961EH1
2020-02-10HousePending question ordered
2020-02-10HouseAmendments by Delegate Helmer agreed to
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107888D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107888D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104855D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161278.9(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.4(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.13(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:01(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.7(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.8(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.9(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback