VA HB920 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Funding among highway systems. Advances from July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2014, the expiration date of the annual allocation that can be made by the Commonwealth Transportation Board.
Title
Highway systems; funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101706D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB920 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB920+hil |