VA HB900 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; mental health and parental notification policies. Provides that any person licensed to diagnose and treat mental, emotional, or behavioral disorders who is treating a student may determine to withhold parental notification of a dependent student's mental health treatment if such person determines that the notification may result in substantial harm. Currently, only a physician or clinical psychologist can make such a determination.
Title
Higher educational institutions; mental health and parental notification policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0448) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 448 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB900ER) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103423D |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)