VA HB894 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; electronic meetings. Amends the number of all-virtual public meetings that public bodies, with certain exceptions, may convene in a calendar year to no more than two times per calendar year or 50 percent of the meetings held per calendar year rounded up to the next whole number, whichever is greater. Current law limits the number of all-virtual public meetings to no more than two times per calendar year or 25 percent of the meetings held per calendar year rounded up to the next whole number, whichever is greater. The bill also provides that with respect to all-virtual public meetings, when audio-visual technology is available, a member of a public body shall, for purposes of a quorum, be considered absent from any portion of the meeting during which visual communication with the member is voluntarily disconnected or otherwise fails or during which audio communication involuntarily fails.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; electronic meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 56 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB894ER) |
2024-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 26-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 26-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Procurement/Open Government |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100596D |
Same As/Similar To
SB734 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)