VA HB871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Discovery in criminal cases; copies of discovery for the accused. Provides that for any discovery materials or evidence that the accused is permitted to inspect and review, the accused may request the Commonwealth to copy or photograph such discovery materials or evidence, and the Commonwealth shall provide such copies or photographs to the accused or his counsel.
Title
Discovery in criminal cases; copies of discovery for the accused.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103254D |