VA HB863 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Education (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Stricken from docket by Education (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local law enforcement; certain reports to school principals and division superintendents; form and scope. Requires local law-enforcement authorities to report in writing, and the principal or his designee and the division superintendent to receive each such report, on (i) any suspected offense, offense for which any charge has been filed, or offense that is subject to investigation, that was committed by a student enrolled at the school if the offense would be a felony if committed by an adult or would be a violation of the Drug Control Act and occurred on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored activity, or would be an adult misdemeanor involving certain enumerated incidents, and (ii) whether the student is released to the custody of his parent or, if 18 years of age or older, is released on bond. Current law does not require such reports to be in writing and only applies to student offenses but does not specify whether such reports are required to be made for student offenses that are suspected, charged, or subject to investigation.
Title
Local law enforcement; certain reports to school principals and division superintendents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Stricken from docket by Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103242D |