VA HB85 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; campaign finance; contribution limits; penalty. Imposes contribution limits on individuals giving to campaigns, political action committees and political party committees and on campaign committees contributing to other campaign committees, political action committees, or political party committees. The bill authorizes a political party committee to keep a separate legal fund for the sole purpose of paying for legal expenses.
Title
Campaign finance; contribution limits, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101403D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 946.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 946.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 953.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |