VA HB82 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; Uninsured Employer's Fund; financing tax. Repeals an enactment clause that provides that the maximum tax rate that may be assessed on insurance carriers or self-insured employers for the purpose of funding workers' compensation benefits that are awarded against uninsured employers from the Uninsured Employer's Fund will revert from 0.5 percent to 0.25 percent on July 1, 2018. Repealing the enactment will maintain the maximum rate at its current level of 0.5 percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; Uninsured Employer's Fund, financing tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0249)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 249 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB82ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 5-N)
2018-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-22HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-18HouseRead first time
2018-01-16HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2017-12-07HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101060D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback