VA HB808 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning assessments; scoring. Requires the Department of Education, in scoring each individual Standards of Learning assessment, to utilize the highest score achieved by the student on each section of the assessment during any administration of the assessment.
Title
Standards of Learning assessments; scoring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100735D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB808 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB808+hil |