VA HB774 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Life cycle of renewable energy facilities; report. Directs the State Corporation Commission, in consultation with the Department of Energy and the Department of Environmental Quality, to create a task force to analyze the life cycle of renewable energy facilities in the Commonwealth. The State Corporation Commission shall report the findings of the task force to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources no later than May 1, 2023.
Title
Renewable energy facilities; SCC shall create a task force to analyze life cycle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB774ER) |
2022-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB774H1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105192D-H1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105192D-H1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101727D |
Same As/Similar To
SB499 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
SB499 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
SB499 (Same As) 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
Subjects
Energy Conservation and Resources
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
State Corporation Commission
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation