VA HB761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission; availability of complaint forms. Requires that a sign be posted in all state courts of the Commonwealth, in a location accessible to the public, that notes the availability of and provides instructions to obtain a downloadable electronic version of any standardized form developed and utilized by the Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission for the filing of a complaint from the official website of the judicial system of the Commonwealth. Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission; availability of complaint forms. Requires that a sign be posted in all state courts of the Commonwealth, in a location accessible to the public, that notes the availability of and provides instructions to obtain a downloadable electronic version of any standardized form developed and utilized by the Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission for the filing of a complaint from the official website of the judicial system of the Commonwealth.
Title
Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission; availability of complaint forms.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB761ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate receded from substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106882D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB761S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106882D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106882D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB761H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106113D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106113D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102454D |