VA HB719 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes; immigration status; civil action; penalty. Adds immigration status to the bases of a victim's intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property that result in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also adds immigration status to the bases of hate crimes that are to be reported to the central repository of information regarding hate crimes maintained by the Virginia State Police. The bill also provides that a person who is subjected to acts of (i) intimidation or harassment, (ii) violence, or (iii) vandalism to his real or personal property, where such act is motived by animosity toward a person's immigration status, may bring a civil action to recover his damages. The bill also provides that no provider or user of an interactive computer service on the Internet shall be liable for any action voluntarily taken by it in good faith to restrict access to material that the provider or user considers to be intended to incite hatred on the basis of immigration status.
Title
Hate crimes; immigration status, civil action, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102334D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 49.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |