VA HB71 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; prohibited contributions to candidates; Phase I Utility and Phase II Utility. Prohibits candidates, campaign committees, and political committees from soliciting or accepting contributions from any public utility, as defined in the bill, and prohibits any public utility or any political committee established by such public utility from making any such contribution.
Title
Campaign finance; prohibited contributions to candidates, Phase I Utility and Phase II Utility.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100590D |