VA HB701 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; school meal policies; parental notification and opt-out. Requires each school board to adopt policies that (i) require each elementary and secondary school in the school division to send to the parents of each student by the end of the first week of the school year notice of the consequences of school meal debt and the school board policy and procedure relating to such debt, including any requirement that such student be served an alternative meal or be required to dispose of meals served to him while such debt remains unpaid; (ii) require any elementary or secondary school in the school division to resend such notice to the parents of any student who accrues a school meal debt before the consequences of such debt go into effect; and (iii) require the parents of any student who do not want their child to be served a school meal to submit a written request to the student's school.
Title
School boards; school meal policies, parental notification and opt-out.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N) (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104148D |