VA HB691 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Business entities; conversion and domestication. Provides that, for the purposes of the Virginia Nonstock Corporation Act, the Virginia Limited Liability Act, and the Virginia Business Trust Act, "entity conversion" has the same meaning as "conversion" as defined in each respective act and that a certificate of entity conversion is the same as a certificate of conversion. Additionally, the bill provides that "incorporation surrender," "organization surrender," and "trust surrender" have the same meaning as "domestication" as defined in each such respective act and that a certificate of incorporation surrender, certificate of organization surrender, and a certificate of trust surrender are the same as a certificate of domestication.
Title
Business entities; conversion and domestication.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082) | |
2022-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 82 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB691ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101240D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |