VA HB672 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; malicious wounding; aggravated malicious wounding. Adds the crimes of malicious wounding and aggravated malicious wounding to offenses for which registration is required on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry if the perpetrator of the crime was an adult, the victim was under the age of 13, and the crime was committed on or after July 1, 2016.
Title
Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry; malicious wounding, aggravated malicious wounding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-05 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103674D |
Same As/Similar To
HB177 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB672 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB672+hil |