VA HB672 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Grant Program. Expands the Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Zone into a statewide grant program and allows the Virginia Port Authority and the Department of Taxation to exchange information.
Title
Port of Virginia Economic and Infrastructure Development Grant Program; expands existing program.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Matthew James [D] |
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470) | |
2014-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB672ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB672H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14103666D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-27 | House | Incorporates HB871 |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103666D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14101429D |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101429D |
Same As/Similar To
HB871 (Similar To) 2014-01-27 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 132.3:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |