VA HB670 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Door locking mechanisms and other safety devices. Provides that the Department of Housing and Community Development shall convene stakeholders representing entities that enforce the Uniform Statewide Building Code and the Virginia Statewide Fire Prevention Code, other law-enforcement organizations, and representatives of local governments throughout the Commonwealth to develop proposals for changes to the USBC and SFPC for submission to the Board of Housing and Community Development. Such proposals shall have the goal of assisting in the provision of safety and security measures for the Commonwealth's public buildings for active-shooter or hostile threats while maintaining compliance with basic accessibility requirements under the federal Americans with Disabilities Act.
Title
USBC &SFPC; proposal for changes to the Codes to address active shooters or hostile threats.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB670ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108224D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB670S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108224D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108224D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB670H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106194D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106194D-H1 |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103879D |
Same As/Similar To
SB333 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)