VA HB641 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Employment certificates for children. Increases the age at which children are required to have a work-training certificate or part-time employment certificate from 16 to 18, provided that any individual who has obtained a standard diploma, advanced studies diploma, or general achievement diploma shall not be required to have an employment certificate.
Title
Children; employment certificate requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103717D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 79.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 84 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 87 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 88 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 89 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |