VA HB628 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - House: Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - House: Engrossment refused by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Undergrounding of electric transmission lines. Amends existing provisions related to the undergrounding of certain electric transmission lines to provide that if there is a feasible overhead alternative for construction of a transmission line of 150 kilovolts or more, the State Corporation Commission shall not approve construction of such transmission line as an underground line, unless all the localities in which the line passes request construction of such line underground in accordance with existing procedures.
Title
Electric transmission lines; amends existing provisions related to undergrounding of certain lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossment refused by House | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103863D |