VA HB624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; work group; strategies to meet behavioral health safety net workforce needs; report. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group, which shall include representatives of the Department of Health Professions, the Virginia Association of Community Services Boards, the Virginia Area Health Education Centers Program and regional area health education centers, the Virginia Community College System, the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, and other relevant stakeholders, to develop a strategy to address the behavioral health safety net workforce shortage in the Commonwealth. The bill directs the work group to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022.
Title
Behavioral health safety net workforce needs; DBHDS to develop strategy to address, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103911D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation