VA HB61 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Adults sentenced for juvenile offenses; good conduct credit. Provides that an adult sentenced for a juvenile offense can earn good conduct credit at the rate of one day for each one day served, including all days served while confined in jail or secured detention prior to conviction and sentencing, in which the adult has not violated the written rules and regulations of the jail. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference and is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adults sentenced for juvenile offenses; good conduct credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
2020-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020
2020-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020
2020-02-20SenateSigned by President
2020-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB61ER)
2020-02-19HouseEnrolled
2020-02-17SenatePassed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
2020-02-17SenateRead third time
2020-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReported from Judiciary (11-Y 2-N)
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N)
2020-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N)
2020-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2019-12-03HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101347D

Same As/Similar To

SB307 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161284(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback