VA SB307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adults sentenced for juvenile offenses; good conduct credit. Provides that an adult sentenced for a juvenile offense can earn good conduct credit at the rate of one day for each one day served, including all days served while confined in jail or secured detention prior to conviction and sentencing, in which the adult has not violated the written rules and regulations of the jail.
Title
Adults sentenced for juvenile offenses; good conduct credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB307ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100962D |
Same As/Similar To
HB61 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)