VA HB590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Storage of firearms in residence where minor present; penalty. Requires any person who possesses a firearm in a residence where such person knows or reasonably should know that a minor under 18 years of age is present to store such firearm unloaded in a locked container, compartment, or cabinet, and to store all ammunition in a separate locked container, compartment, or cabinet. The bill requires that the key or combination to such locked containers, compartments, or cabinets be inaccessible to minors. The bill provides that a violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor, and, in a case where there is more than one firearm stored in violation of these provisions, each firearm shall constitute a separate Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts any person in lawful possession of a firearm who exercises immediate control, defined in the bill, and when the firearm is an antique firearm. Storage of firearms in residence where minor present; penalty. Requires any person who possesses a firearm in a residence where such person knows or reasonably should know that a minor under 18 years of age is present to store such firearm unloaded in a locked container, compartment, or cabinet, and to store all ammunition in a separate locked container, compartment, or cabinet. The bill requires that the key or combination to such locked containers, compartments, or cabinets be inaccessible to minors. The bill provides that a violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor, and, in a case where there is more than one firearm stored in violation of these provisions, each firearm shall constitute a separate Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts any person in lawful possession of a firearm who exercises immediate control, defined in the bill, and when the firearm is an antique firearm.
Title
Firearms; storage in residence where minor present, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103827D |