VA HB576 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stay of debt collection activities by health care providers; prohibited practice under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Provides that any health care provider that undertakes any debt collection activities prior to either the issuance of an award from or the determination that a claim is noncompensable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund has committed a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Stay of debt collection activities by health care providers; prohibited practice under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Provides that any health care provider that undertakes any debt collection activities prior to either the issuance of an award from or the determination that a claim is noncompensable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund has committed a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Health care providers; debt collection activities, prohibited practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-02-11 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred from Commerce and Energy by voice vote |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102040D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 368.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |