VA HB568 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing home standards of care. Increases the staffing and care standards in nursing homes to require a minimum of specific direct care services to each resident per 24-hour period.
Title
Nursing homes; increases staffing and care standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned HWI sub: # 3 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103140D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB568 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB568+hil |