VA HB567 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual battery by touching a person's intimate parts; penalty. Provides that a person is guilty of sexual battery (punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor) if he sexually abuses within a two-year period more than one complaining witness or one complaining witness on more than one occasion intentionally and without the consent of the complaining witness.
Title
Sexual battery; touching a person's intimate parts, etc., penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB567ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105076D-S1 (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB567S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105076D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105076D-S1 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB567H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104216D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104216D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102312D |