VA HB550 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N)
Pending: Senate Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee
Hearing: Mar 1 @ 8:00 am in Senate Room A, General Assembly Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adult adoptee access to original birth certificate. Grants any adoptee 18 years of age or older access to his original birth certificate. Adult adoptee access to original birth certificate. Grants any adoptee 18 years of age or older access to his original birth certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult adoptee; access to original birth certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-01SenateContinued to 2025 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 6-N)
2024-02-15SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2024-02-15SenateRereferred from Education and Health (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
2024-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2024-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N)
2024-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N)
2024-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 24101022D-E
2024-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB550E
2024-01-26HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2024-01-26HouseRead second time
2024-01-25HouseRead first time
2024-01-23HouseReported from Health and Human Services with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N)
2024-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-17HouseAssigned sub: Social Services
2024-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2024-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101022D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321261(n/a)See Bill Text
6321246(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB550
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB550+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB550E+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24105712A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+amd+HB550AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB550F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB550FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H2404V0007+HB0550
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H24V0028+HB0550
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0092+HB0550
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S04V0155+HB0550
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S09V0094+HB0550

Bill Comments

feedback