VA HB541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alternative treatment options for certain veterans; report. Directs the Department of Veterans Services to consider the efficacy of alternative treatments available for the treatment of traumatic brain injury and posttraumatic stress disorder and report its findings and conclusions to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health. The bill defines "alternative treatment" as a therapeutic service that (i) is not part of the standard of medical care established by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs for treating traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder but has been shown by at least one scientific or medical peer-reviewed study to have some positive effect on traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder and (ii) is provided at the direction and under the supervision of an individual licensed by the Board of Medicine, Nursing, Counseling, Psychology, or Social Work.
Title
Veterans, certain; alternative treatment options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100200D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB541E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100200D |