VA HB537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local fees and fines. Directs the clerk of the circuit court to pay local fees and fines collected by the general district or juvenile and domestic relations district courts directly to the local government.
Title
Clerk of circuit court; local fees and fines paid directly to local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 244 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB537ER) |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102991D |