VA HB517 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax deductions; life, medical, and dental insurance premiums. Creates individual income tax deductions beginning January 1, 2012, for (i) life insurance premiums paid by the individual for a life insurance policy covering him and (ii) medical and dental insurance premiums paid by the individual for any person for which individual tax filers may claim a deduction for such premiums under federal income tax laws.
Title
Income tax, state; creates deductions for life, medical, and dental insurance premiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-02-06 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102432D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB517 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB517+hil |