VA HB517 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; violations; nonresidential property. Provides that a court may order violations of the Uniform Statewide Building Code on nonresidential buildings or structures be abated or otherwise remedied if the violations remain when the court is authorized to assess civil penalties. Currently the court is required to order abatement for residential buildings or structures but is not authorized to do so if the building or structure is nonresidential.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; court may order violations on nonresidential buildings be abated.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB517ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101789D |