VA HB5108 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal Justice Services Board; Committee on Training; membership and responsibilities. Changes the membership of the Criminal Justice Services Board and its Committee on Training by requiring that some members be representatives of a social justice organization, representatives of community interests of minorities, and mental health service providers. The bill requires that the Committee on Training include a representative from the Virginia Indigent Defense Commission, a representative of the community interests of minorities, and a mental health service provider. In addition, the bill permits the Committee on Training to appoint curriculum review committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice Services Board and Committee on Training; change in membership & responsibilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateSigned by President
2020-10-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5108ER)
2020-10-14HouseEnrolled
2020-10-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 41-N)
2020-10-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20201295D-S2 (55-Y 41-N)
2020-10-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N)
2020-10-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB5108S2
2020-10-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Locke agreed to 20201295D-S2
2020-10-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-02SenateCommittee substitute rejected
2020-10-02SenateRead third time
2020-10-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201295D-S2 (Locke)
2020-10-01SenatePassed by for the day
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201188D-S1
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 4-N)
2020-09-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-03HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-09-03HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-08-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5108H1
2020-08-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201000D-H1
2020-08-28HouseRead second time
2020-08-27HouseRead first time
2020-08-25HouseSubstitute bill reprinted 20201000D-H1
2020-08-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201000D-H1
2020-08-25HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-21HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-08-21HousePresented and ordered printed 20200841D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91107(n/a)See Bill Text
91108(n/a)See Bill Text
91112(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5108&202+sum+HB5108
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5108+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5108H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5108S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5108S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5108ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0009+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0042+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0070+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0054+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5108+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0215HB5108+HB5108
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0182+HB5108

Bill Comments

feedback