VA HB5029 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officer; failure to intervene in an excessive use of force; penalties. Requires that any law-enforcement officer who while in the performance of his official duties witnesses another law-enforcement officer engaging or attempting to engage in the use of excessive force, defined in the bill, against another person shall intervene, when such intervention is objectively reasonable and possible, to end the use of excessive force or attempted use of excessive force, or to prevent the further use of excessive force. The bill also requires a law-enforcement officer to render aid, as circumstances objectively permit, to any person injured as the result of such use of excessive force. The bill requires a law-enforcement officer to report intervention or use of excessive force in accordance with his employing agency's policies for reporting misconduct. The bill provides that any law-enforcement officer who violates the provisions of the bill shall be subject to disciplinary action.
Title
Law-enforcement officer; failure to intervene in an unlawful use of excessive force, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 39-N) (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025) | |
2020-10-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 25 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5029ER) |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 39-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20201297D-S2 (57-Y 39-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-10-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 17-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB5029S2 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Locke agreed to |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20201297D-S2 (Locke) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201180D-S1 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-09-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-09-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB5029H1 |
2020-09-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20201020D-H1 |
2020-09-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-02 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-08-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-08-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 20201020D-H1 |
2020-08-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-08-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200388D |