VA HB492 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Notaries; providing advice on immigration; advertising. Prohibits a notary public from offering or providing legal advice to any person in immigration or other legal matters or representing any person in immigration proceedings unless such notary public is an attorney or a federally accredited representative. The bill also restricts misleading notary advertising in languages other than English. The bill also provides for civil penalties and revocation of the notary commission for such unauthorized advertising.
Title
Notaries; if not accredited to represent persons in immigration proceedings, shall not offer advice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 783 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB492ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 2-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 1-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's substitute printed 14105537D-H2 |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB492ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105267D-S1 (91-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB492S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105267D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105267D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB492H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104581D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104581D-H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102653D |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)