VA HB490 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health care providers; electronic medical records; metadata. Requires health care providers, upon request of a patient or the patient's attorney, to provide the patient with the metadata of the patient's electronic medical record. The bill defines "metadata" for the purposes of this provision.
Title
Health care providers; electronic medical records.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101009D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB490 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB490+hil |