VA HB482 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonpayment of wages; private action. Affirms that an employee has cause of action against an employer who fails to pay wages to recover the wages and prejudgment interest at eight percent annually from the date the wages were due. The measure provides that if the court finds that the employer knowingly failed to pay the wages, it shall also award the employee reasonable attorney fees and court costs. If the court finds that the employer's failure to pay wages was willful and with intent to defraud the employee, the court shall also award the employee reasonable attorney fees and court costs plus an additional sum equal to the amount of wages due.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonpayment of wages; private action.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseIncorporated by Labor and Commerce
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB123-Carroll Foy) by voice vote
2020-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103335D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40129(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback