NC S425 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Ch. SL 2024-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
HHS Omnibus
Title
HHS Omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Ch. SL 2024-34 | |
2024-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2024 | |
2024-06-28 | Ratified | |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-27 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2024-06-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-27 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2024-06-26 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2024-06-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-19 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2024-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Assault
Boards
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Custody
Colleges & Universities
Company Police
Contracts
Controlled Substances
Corporations
Correctional Institutions
Counseling
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Definitions
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Early Childhood Education
Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Family Issues
Foster Care
Government Employees
Greenville
Health
Health Boards
Health Depts.
Health Services
Higher Education
Inmates
Insurance
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Lmes-mcos
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Medicaid
Mental Health
Minors
Municipalities
Newborns & Infants
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Pitt County
Poverty
Presented
Psychiatry
Psychology
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Session Laws
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
State Employees
State Health Director
Title Change
Unc
Unc Health Care
Assault
Boards
Budgeting
Chaptered
Child Custody
Colleges & Universities
Company Police
Contracts
Controlled Substances
Corporations
Correctional Institutions
Counseling
Counties
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Definitions
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Early Childhood Education
Education
Emergency Services
Employment
Family Issues
Foster Care
Government Employees
Greenville
Health
Health Boards
Health Depts.
Health Services
Higher Education
Inmates
Insurance
Kindergarten
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Lmes-mcos
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Medicaid
Mental Health
Minors
Municipalities
Newborns & Infants
Nonprofit
Partnership For Children
Personnel
Pharmaceuticals
Pitt County
Poverty
Presented
Psychiatry
Psychology
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Session Laws
Social Services
Social Services Depts.
State Employees
State Health Director
Title Change
Unc
Unc Health Care
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
108A | 105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108D | 40 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
110 | 86 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
110 | 88.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
110 | 90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 350.105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 350.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 40.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
122C | 115 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
122C | 118.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 40 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 14.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
131E | 88 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 77 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 521 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7B | 525 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text |